Financial history BLEADON CORONATION HALL

Charity number: 1042602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.55k £26.69k £27.03k £23.80k £11.59k
Total expenditure £14.82k £12.67k £21.72k £12.78k £5.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k