SHADWELL PLAYGROUND CAMPAIGN

Charity number: 1042605
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 July 2020 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 March 2020 510 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 November 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required