Luton Islamic Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of prayer facilities for men and women, weekly Friday sermon, regular seminars and conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 08 December 1994: Standard registration
- CALL TO ISLAM BOOKSHOP (Previous name)
- CALL TO ISLAM EDUCATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Farasat Latif | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Mohammad Sayeid Al-Jamee | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
bassam ali khalil abu haj | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.61k | £157.32k | £167.22k | £197.67k | £180.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.57k | £153.22k | £132.62k | £149.94k | £151.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 16 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 01 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ISLAMIC CULTURE, ART AND HISTORY. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH. (C) THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONGST WOMEN BY THE PROVISION OF A RESOURCE CENTRE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LUTON ISLAMIC CENTRE
116 BURY PARK ROAD
LUTON
LU1 1HE
- Phone:
- 01582 724647
- Email:
- info@lutonislamiccentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window