LONDON CHILDREN'S BALLET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the knowledge, education and experience of the art of the ballet for children in the South East of England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- THE LONDONS CHILDREN'S BALLET (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600.70k | £417.54k | £621.90k | £464.99k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.89k | £464.38k | £480.92k | £519.21k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £185.70k | N/A | £185.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £213.16k | N/A | £229.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £201.76k | N/A | £207.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £85 | N/A | £128 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £348.60k | N/A | £361.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.72k | N/A | £24.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 31 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 31 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 31 May 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION AND FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION IN AND THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE ART OF AND CRAFT OF BALLET DANCING FOR CHILDREN (AGES 8-15 YEARS OLD)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window