ST MINVER CP SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1042647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.71k £9.93k £11.62k £9.63k £3.50k
Total expenditure £6.75k £10.39k £11.19k £12.98k £2.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.00k N/A N/A