BE FREE YOUNG CARERS LTD

Charity number: 1042708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £161.77k £112.22k £167.88k £149.04k £303.37k
Total expenditure £160.41k £154.22k £129.66k £148.72k £167.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.90k £49.47k £44.94k £48.75k £53.96k