Trustees THE MEDIA TRUST
Charity number: 1042733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Owain Thomas | Chair | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Etebom Patrick Davies | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Osei-Nsafoah | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Black | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Exon | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Paul Tomlinson | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tove Okunniwa | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Satyen Vallabh Dayal | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Edwards | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edmon Paul Couchman | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Ahmed | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.