BASINGSTOKE WEST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities and support for Scouting in North Hampshire covering West Basingstoke, Oakley and Overton and neighbouring villages. Putting on the biennial Basingstoke Gang Show and involved with and supporting the shop run by Basingstoke Scouting Supplies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
395 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Leon Gath | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Vaughan | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Locke | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Warmington | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Holdsworth | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kiy | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BIRTLES | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.01k | £58.81k | £42.81k | £51.38k | £66.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.42k | £53.95k | £35.23k | £67.23k | £97.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Avon Green
Chandler's Ford
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO53 2NL
- Phone:
- 07309580328
- Email:
- treasurer@bwds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window