FRIENDS OF NORTH BIRMINGHAM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1042762
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 16 JANUARY 2001 AND 18 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE ACADEMY
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 13 December 1994 : registered
  • 04 March 2019 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • EASTGLADE PRIMARY AND NURSERY FUND (Previous name)
  • FRIENDS OF PERRY COMMON (Previous name)
  • FRIENDS OF THE COLLEGE HIGH SCHOOL (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources