THE UNIVERSITY OF LIVERPOOL LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1042804
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 2002 AND 07 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE WORK OF THE FACULTY OF LAW B. THE SUPPORT OF AND ASSISTANCE TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE FACULTY OF LAW AND TO PROMOTE ALL ASPECTS OF SUCH WORK
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 15 December 1994 : registered
  • 05 September 2008 : removed (VOLUNTARY REMOVAL)
Other names
  • U.L.L.A (Working name)
  • THE UNIVERSITY OF LIVERPOOL LAW FACULTY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helped
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research