Accounts and annual returns THIRD CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST LEEDS
Charity number: 1042811
Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 264 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 264 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 629 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 629 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 September 2023 | 785 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 04 January 2020 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window