11TH FINCHLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1042861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 November 2019 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 November 2019 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time Download