THE DAVID FRYER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1042978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.38k £1.40k £998 £1.66k £1.41k
Total expenditure £865 £1.09k £1.02k £1.35k £1.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A