Accounts and annual returns THE ROBERT BLACK MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 1043140

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 407 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 18 March 2021 | 772 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window