Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREWS METHODIST CHURCH PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1043199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required