BELMONT CASTLE ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1043330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 August 2020 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 June 2019 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 June 2018 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 July 2017 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required