Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF LYTHAM TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1043480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 June 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required