Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF LYTHAM TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1043480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £28.65k £38.71k £21.73k £9.77k £11.00k
Total expenditure £24.01k £34.75k £17.50k £6.05k £21.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A