FRIENDS OF GREAT ELLINGHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1043484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for extra facilities/equipment for the school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £7,348
Total expenditure: £7,627

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Blyth Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Cheryl London Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.48k £3.13k £0 £3.08k £7.35k
Total expenditure £3.92k £4.33k £259 £1.48k £7.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Great Ellingham Cp School
Hingham Road
Great Ellingham
ATTLEBOROUGH
Norfolk
NR17 1HX
Phone:
01953453342
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available