NOVI MOST INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1043501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 07 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download