Financial history NOVI MOST INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1043501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £226.14k £203.07k £234.33k £194.17k £176.18k
Total expenditure £256.30k £224.02k £187.47k £168.43k £158.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A