NOVI MOST INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1043501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna Hedley Chair 20 February 2014 None on record
Peter Gray Trustee 04 March 2021 None on record
Rev Gillian Rowell Trustee 16 March 2018 None on record
Michael Elliot Trustee 17 September 2015 None on record
SIMON TIMOTHY EVANS FCA DCHA Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM Received: On time
Rev PAUL LEWIS Trustee 04 March 2021
THE BROMSGROVE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY HUB Recently registered
BROMSGROVE BAPTIST CHURCH Received: On time
BROMSGROVE STREET PASTORS Received: On time
PETER FLORY Trustee 21 April 2011
CORNELIUS TRUST Received: On time
CHESHAM BOIS C E COMBINED SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LEONARD'S, CHESHAM BOIS Received: On time
CHILTERN CHRISTIAN TRUST Received: 17 days late