Financial history MRS ALICE LILIAN NASH WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1043563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £25.46k £66.22k £18.84k £12.93k £16.81k
Total expenditure £15.05k £27.09k £18.41k £7.01k £12.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A