Trustees WITTON CHURCH WALK PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1043573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Jackson | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Lambert | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Marie Denton | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Storton | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Warburton | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gina Bebbington | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adele Bebbington-Plant | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Gleave | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.