WALLACE & GROMIT'S CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1043603
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.85m £3.09m £3.05m £4.52m £2.57m
Total expenditure £4.51m £2.15m £2.52m £2.55m £2.49m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £50.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.54m £1.98m £1.83m £3.26m £1.80m
Income - Other trading activities £4.29m £1.09m £1.20m £1.23m £730.64k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.40k £9.87k £17.06k £32.39k £38.22k
Income - Other £1.75k £4.65k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £152.57k £0 £0 £5.00k £120.77k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £978.03k £1.05m £1.06m £1.55m £1.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.53m £254.94k £311.87k £331.09k £341.17k
Expenditure - Governance £174.14k £199.59k £202.81k £354.98k £367.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £803.90k £420.93k £0 £629.04k £561.82k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £848.23k £1.15m £675.21k £636.21k