WALLACE & GROMIT'S CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Grand Appeal supports Bristol Children's Hospital The Cots for Tots Appeal supports St Michael's Hospital Bristol Wallace & Gromit's Children's Charity supports children in hospitals & hospices nationally Gromit Unleashed: a charity event for the Grand Appeal Shaun in the City: a charity event for the Grand Appeal & Wallace & Gromit's Children's Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,860,047
Donations and legacies | £2.74m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £900.61k | |
Investments | £223.28k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,102,822
Raising funds | £575.81k | |
Charitable activities | £1.63m | |
Other | £900.13k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.48m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.63m | |
Retained for future use | £757.23k |
People

40 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- BRISTOL CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL APPEAL (Working name)
- GROMIT UNLEASHED (Working name)
- THE COTS FOR TOTS APPEAL (Working name)
- THE GRAND APPEAL (Working name)
- WALLACE AND GROMIT'S CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION (Working name)
- WALLACE AND GROMIT'S GRAND APPEAL (Working name)
- WRONG TROUSERS DAY (Working name)
- BRISTOL CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL APPEAL (Previous name)
- THE GRAND APPEAL - WALLACE AND GROMIT'S GRAND APPEAL (Previous name)
- THE HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN, BRISTOL APPEAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL HOSPITAL FOR CHILDREN BRISTOL APPEAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN BRISTOL APPEAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE WRONG TROUSERS DAY (Previous name)
- WALLACE & GROMITS GRAND APPEAL (Previous name)
- WALLACE & GROMITT'S CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- WALLACE AND GROMITS GRAND APPEAL (Previous name)
- More
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jos Moule | Chair | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
Michael Lea | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Angie Last | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MIKE NORTON | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON CHARLES BOWDEN COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.57m | £2.55m | £3.08m | £3.17m | £3.86m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49m | £2.43m | £2.39m | £2.92m | £3.10m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.13k | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.80m | £1.84m | £2.21m | £2.16m | £2.74m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £730.64k | £642.22k | £862.42k | £997.71k | £900.61k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £38.22k | £2.70k | £562 | £18.93k | £223.28k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £63.13k | £7.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £120.77k | £333.19k | £300.64k | £292.08k | £420.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.52m | £1.45m | £1.20m | £1.43m | £1.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £341.17k | £371.11k | £379.60k | £553.77k | £575.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £367.12k | £387.06k | £232.75k | £256.39k | £333.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £561.82k | £446.36k | £243.15k | £444.58k | £526.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £636.21k | £604.20k | £813.30k | £937.89k | £900.13k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.49m | £2.46m | £2.59m | £3.07m | £3.12m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £199.46k | |
|
Other assets | £6.72m | £6.93m | £7.45m | £7.22m | £7.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £142.35k | £209.16k | £165.93k | £154.59k | £297.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/01/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/12/2014
Charitable objects
1. THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN'S SERVICES PROVIDED BY OR AT HOSPITALS OF THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS BRISTOL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (OR ANY SUCCESSOR BODY) (TRUST) FOR THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF CHILDREN WITH ILLNESSES, DISEASES OR DISABILITIES, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR USE IN THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH CHILDREN; (B) THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN; (C) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, AMENITIES AND SUPPORT FOR THE RELATIVES OF SUCH CHILDREN; AND (D) THE PROVISION, IMPROVEMENT OR ENHANCEMENT OF ANY HOSPITAL BUILDINGS 2. THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF CHILDREN'S SERVICES PROVIDED BY OR AT HOSPITALS AND HOSPICES FOR THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF CHILDREN, WITH ILLNESSES, DISEASES OR DISABILITIES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH EQUIPMENT AMENITIES AND FACILITIES AS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLE 3.1.1. 3. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, EFFECTS AND TREATMENT OF CHILDHOOD ILLNESSES, DISEASES AND DISABILITIES AND THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF CHILDREN WITH SUCH ILLNESSES, DISEASES AND DISABILITIES, WHETHER RELATED TO SUCH RESEARCH OR NOT; 4. THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS, DISEASE AND DISABILITY IN CHILDREN GENERALLY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30/32 Upper Maudlin Street
Bristol
BS2 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01179273888
- Email:
- info@grandappeal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window