Accounts and annual returns THE LAND STEWARDSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1043610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 01 April 2022 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 02 December 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 02 December 2020 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 24 June 2019 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 20 June 2019 596 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required