Accounts and annual returns PARK HILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 01 July 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required