Financial history FRIENDS OF ENDIKE

Charity number: 1043655
Charity reporting is overdue by 143 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.59k £1.72k £435 £3.39k £0
Total expenditure £529 £867 £145 £160 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A