Accounts and annual returns ST BRIDGET'S SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 January 2022 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 January 2022 561 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 January 2022 927 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1755 days