FOLKESTONE PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENTS, TEACHERS, FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required