FOLKESTONE PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENTS, TEACHERS, FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.87k £7.76k £8.50k £7.11k £1.89k
Total expenditure £7.62k £4.94k £7.18k £6.22k £2.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A