DEVON CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Devon, DCMA operates a country wide service offering information, advice and training to childminders and those working or volunteering in the childcare sector, also advice to parents and other interested parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 1995: Standard registration
- 03 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- D C M A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.41k | £23.28k | £17.59k | £14.47k | £10.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.06k | £22.78k | £19.46k | £13.21k | £13.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 March 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 17 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1983 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 1994, 8 OCTOBER 2005 AND 22 OCTOBER 2007, 2 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS AND PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN, AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window