Accounts and annual returns ADRIAN SIDAWAY MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1043825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 18 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required