REHAB UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rehab UK was not active in 2018 as it effectively ceased its activities in 2009 transferring some of its services to Momentum Scotland (another charity within the Rehab Group). The directors wish to complete the orderly wind down of the company's affairs at which point they will make a decision as to its future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 February 1995: Standard registration
- 23 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £687.92k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £687.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 20 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 18TH MAY 2000 AND 26TH OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION TRAINING AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR OTHERWISE ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN SUITABLE EMPLOYMENT, TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION AND TO THE ESTABLISH AND MANAGE SERVICES TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO BE TRAINED, EDUCATED OR REHABILITATED; AND (2) TO PROMOTE, FURTHER AND SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT, TRAINING, EQUIPMENT, EDUCATION, WELFARE, CARE AND REHABILITATION OF SUFFERERS FROM ANY DISEASE, ILLNESS, ACCIDENT AND PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SOCIAL NEED OR DISABILITY, SO FAR AS THE SAME COMPRISE CHARITABLE PURPOSES; AND (3) TO ESTABLISH, SUPPORT OR ASSIST IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OR IN THE SUPPORT OF ANY OTHER CHARITY AND TO SUBSCRIBE, GUARANTEE MONEY AND MAKE DONATIONS TO ANY SUCH CHARITY FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window