Accounts and annual returns LIVING WATERS FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1043869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 01 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required