Financial history LIVING WATERS FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1043869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £14.58k £15.38k £27.77k £55.64k £39.29k
Total expenditure £17.15k £15.67k £16.70k £25.12k £38.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A