Financial history BARNHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044033
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £75.90k £68.62k £79.22k £62.24k £54.46k
Total expenditure £76.80k £70.08k £79.08k £68.83k £41.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £39.47k