Financial history THE FRIENDS OF GREEN LEA

Charity Number: 1044116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £22.78k £883 £1.74k £4.14k £4.23k
Total expenditure £3.39k £2.67k £18.75k £2.97k £3.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A