Financial history ST PAUL'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044163
Charity reporting is overdue by 722 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.45k £3.32k £6.37k £2.13k £893
Total expenditure £8.64k £5.47k £1.52k £7.56k £6.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A