CHRISTIAN YOUTH OUTREACH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CYO's mission is to reach young people with the gospel of Jesus Christ. The Solid Rock Youth Centre provides facilities & activities for young people. Committed volunteers provide outreach, support, guidance & friendship. Also responsible for Bridgend Street Pastors seeking to make a positive influence the town's night time economy by showing the love of Christ in a practical way by caring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
Governance
- 16 February 1995: Standard registration
- 26 April 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 26 April 2018: Funds transferred to 1029909 CENTRE FOR INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.30k | £48.58k | £41.66k | £13.77k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.37k | £56.97k | £24.40k | £22.42k | £9.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.60k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £2.90k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 27 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 28 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 25 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 03 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 24 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 07 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIANITY IN PARTICULAR IN THE COMMUNITY OF BRIDGEND BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WITNESS BY PROVIDING A MEETING PLACE FOR CHRISTIAN WITH NON-CHRISTIAN AND CHRISTIAN WITH CHRISTIAN.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BRIDGEND AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window