PRESTON AND DISTRICT DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training/workshop days, presentations, children's dyslexia screening, newsletters, helpline, resource centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 February 1995: Standard registration
- P A D D A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER TILLOTSON | Chair |
|
||||||
HELEN RUTH NUTTALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTORIA MAY BAMBER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41k | £2.17k | £1.22k | £26 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.26k | £2.95k | £2.74k | £1.43k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 16 JANUARY 1995 AND 29 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS DISABLED BY DYSLEXIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
313 HIGHER WALTON ROAD
HIGHER WALTON
PRESTON
PR5 4HU
- Phone:
- 07572 268454
- Email:
- vicky.bamber@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window