HORNDEAN INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds, for the benefit of the school and its children by allowing purchases to be made outside of the usual budget allowances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Battle | Chair | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Stoddart | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91k | £8.91k | £10.33k | £7.34k | £9.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.26k | £3.19k | £8.76k | £10.17k | £6.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £987 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 28 SEPTEMBER 1994 as amended on 19 Jan 2023 as amended on 19 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
2. Purposes The object of the association (the objects) is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 2.1 Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. 2.2 Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORNDEAN INFANT SCHOOL
MERCHISTOUN ROAD
WATERLOOVILLE
PO8 9LS
- Phone:
- 023 9259 3453
- Email:
- pta@horndeaninfants.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window