DULWICH VILLAGE INFANTS' SCHOOL PARENT - TEACHER - FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £28.92k £28.89k £30.15k £38.67k £43.27k
Total expenditure £42.91k £21.29k £51.93k £34.36k £15.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A