Financial history NORTH WOOTTON ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1044323
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £10.12k £10.57k £5.67k £459 £2.76k
Total expenditure £9.27k £13.38k £10.80k £2.38k £1.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A