DISABILITY ACTION YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1044373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.13m £1.16m £1.09m £1.27m £1.37m
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.16m £1.17m £1.20m £1.39m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £176.32k £257.52k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.17k £94.75k £28.84k £65.19k £28.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.03m £1.04m £1.18m £1.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.19k £5.07k £4.31k £5.00k £5.52k
Income - Other £11.53k £32.60k £15.72k £19.91k £22.87k
Income - Legacies £1.00k £25.00k £0 £25.00k £4.41k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.10m £1.11m £1.19m £1.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.16k £61.71k £55.44k £15.31k £17.61k
Expenditure - Governance £15.03k £8.64k £8.80k £6.39k £8.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.47k £2.18k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0