TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (NEWCASTLE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public courses and other events in meditation and Buddhism, guiding and supporting those who wish to follow the Buddhist religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 21 February 1995: Standard registration
- NEWCASTLE BUDDHIST CENTRE (Working name)
- NEWCASTLE BUDDHIST CENTRE F W B O (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (NEWCASTLE) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nandavajra XXX | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Graham Dellow | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Cowen | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Thompson Campbell | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Norman Powell | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DELL | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Wigham | Trustee | 01 January 1999 |
|
|
||||
MS SRADDHAMANI BENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.05k | £25.25k | £16.39k | £50.10k | £21.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.80k | £5.93k | £8.41k | £11.21k | £15.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2024 | 204 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 DECEMBER 1994 NAME CHANGED BY RESOLUTION 15 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NEWCASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newcastle Buddhist Centre
187 Westgate Road
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE4 6AA
- Phone:
- 01914472860
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window