ST MUNGO'S (SIMONBURN) CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1044385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 27 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required