ANGLO DUTCH MIGRAINE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A group of neurologists from England and Holland meet annually to hold a scientific meeting on all aspects oh headache. The purpose of the charity is to promote understanding, knowledge and improve treatments in headache. We publish an account of our meeting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Netherlands
Governance
- 20 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jitka Vanderpol | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tijman Balvers | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Callum Duncan | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor FAYYAZ AHMED | Trustee | 14 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Hans Carpay | Trustee | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manjit Matharu | Trustee | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr EMILE COUTURIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.46k | £2.50k | £1.12k | £27.49k | £9.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.14k | £2.48k | £1.20k | £24.33k | £33.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 March 2022 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2021 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES TREATMENTS AND OTHER ASPECTS OF HEADACHE AND BY DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al Hamd
West Ella Road
West Ella
HULL
HU10 7SD
- Phone:
- 00441482675591
- Email:
- FAYYAZ.AHMED@NHS.NET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window