UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (SOUTH EAST LONDON)

Charity number: 1044428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required